SD HB1248 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding filing and recording secured transaction records with the Office of the Secretary of State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding filing and recording secured transaction records with the Office of the Secretary of State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26SenateSigned by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794
2018-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 759
2018-03-08SenateDelivered to the Governor on 2:50 p.m., March 8, 2018. H.J. 747
2018-03-07SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 737
2018-03-05SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 681
2018-02-28SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 638
2018-02-26SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-02-26SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 596
2018-02-26SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1248wc
2018-02-26SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-02-15SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 486
2018-02-14HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 437
2018-02-12HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-02-12HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 395
2018-02-12HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1248oa
2018-02-12HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1248ka
2018-02-12HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-01-31HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 247

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1248&Session=2018
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1248P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1248HST.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1248SST.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1248ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25615&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25841&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26380&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26571&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26717&Session=2018

Bill Comments

feedback