SD HB1248 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 744
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 744
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for exceptions from certain misdemeanor offenses relating to possession of handguns.
Title
Provide for exceptions from certain misdemeanor offenses relating to possession of handguns.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Rep. Lora Hubbel [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Rep. Don Kopp [R] |
Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Stace Nelson [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] |
Sen. Lance Russell [R] | Rep. Shawn Tornow [R] | Rep. Mike Verchio [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House Veto override (Y: 27 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 744 | |
2012-03-19 | Veto override, Failed, YEAS 27, NAYS 40. H.J. 739 | |
2012-03-19 | Vetoed by the Governor H.J. 737 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by President S.J. 629 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 11. S.J. 601 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 587 | |
2012-02-24 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3. S.J. 554 | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | Re-referred to Senate State Affairs, Passed S.J. 436 | |
2012-02-14 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 407 | |
2012-02-13 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 18. H.J. 443 | |
2012-02-09 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 404 | |
2012-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 218 |