SD HB1244 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Committee on Appropriations Report out of committee without recommendation as amended, Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Committee on Appropriations Report out of committee without recommendation as amended, Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to develop and create a residency program for psychologists and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to develop and create a residency program for psychologists and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Referred as Amended to (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Referred as Amended to (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Report out of committee without recommendation as amended, Passed |
2022-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 46, NAYS 21. H.J. 456 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 24. H.J. 445 |
2022-02-23 | House | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7) House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 429 |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1244B |
2022-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-08 | House | Health and Human Services Referred as Amended to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. |
2022-02-08 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. Amendment 1244A |
2022-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 156 |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 139 |