SD HB1244 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for costs related to disasters in the state.
Title
Make an appropriation for costs related to disasters in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 740 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 677 | |
2011-03-08 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 688 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 5. S.J. 638 | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 616 | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 599 | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 573 | |
2011-02-28 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 546 | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 523 | |
2011-02-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 4. H.J. 502 | |
2011-02-23 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 502 Amendment 1244ta | |
2011-02-22 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 458 | |
2011-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 225 |