SD HB1241 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - No motion to reconsider H.J. 355
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - No motion to reconsider H.J. 355
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for participation in a parent education program upon filing for divorce.
Title
Provide for participation in a parent education program upon filing for divorce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Education: Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Education: Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | No motion to reconsider H.J. 355 |
2021-02-22 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 336 |
2021-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 35, NAYS 33. H.J. 335 |
2021-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 335 Amendment 1241C |
2021-02-17 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 2. |
2021-02-17 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1241A |
2021-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 212 |
2021-02-03 | House | First Reading House H.J. 190 |