SD HB1241 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise requirements for legal newspapers.
Title
Revise requirements for legal newspapers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. |
2020-02-20 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 9. |
2020-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to House Local Government, Passed H.J. 279 |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 257 |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading House H.J. 169 |