SD HB1239 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - Local Government Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 456
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - Local Government Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 456
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establish certain procedures for counties to follow when requiring landowners to cut and remove grass, weeds, and brush from the road right-of-way.
Title
Establish certain procedures for counties to follow when requiring landowners to cut and remove grass, weeds, and brush from the road right-of-way.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Local Government Tabled (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 41 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 41 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | Local Government Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 456 | |
2010-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-12 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 322 | |
2010-02-11 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 41, NAYS 26. H.J. 372 | |
2010-02-09 | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 323 | |
2010-02-09 | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1239fa | |
2010-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-02 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 264 |