SD HB1237 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 453
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 453
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for the purpose of funding county and township roads and bridges and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for the purpose of funding county and township roads and bridges and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Caleb Finck [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Tabled (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Referred to (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Referred to (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 453 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1237C |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 364 |
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 420 |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1237A |
2021-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2021-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to House Transportation H.J. 212 |
2021-02-03 | House | First Reading House H.J. 190 |