SD HB1234 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Require the approval of the Legislature before the state adopts certain changes to the Medicaid program.
Title
Require the approval of the Legislature before the state adopts certain changes to the Medicaid program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 42 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 42 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 501 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 454 |
2016-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 26. H.J. 672 |
2016-02-22 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. |
2016-02-22 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1234ra |
2016-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 288 |