SD HB1234 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the requirement for certain reports to be made to the Board of Economic Development.
Title
Repeal the requirement for certain reports to be made to the Board of Economic Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 740 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 677 | |
2011-03-08 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 688 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 637 | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 616 | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 599 | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 573 | |
2011-02-28 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 547 | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-14 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 414 | |
2011-02-10 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 358 | |
2011-02-09 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-09 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 332 | |
2011-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 223 |