SD HB1232 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the South Dakota Commission on Health Care.
Title
Repeal the South Dakota Commission on Health Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | Signed by Governor H.J. 594 | |
2012-02-22 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by President S.J. 491 | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 513 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 1. S.J. 453 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 405 | |
2012-02-13 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 378 | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-08 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 320 | |
2012-02-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 338 | |
2012-02-06 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-06 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 311 | |
2012-02-06 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 198 |