SD HB1231 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the sale of certain surplus real estate, to appropriate the proceeds to the revolving economic development and initiative fund, and to revise certain provisions relating to the sale of certain surplus property.
Title
Provide for the sale of certain surplus real estate, to appropriate the proceeds to the revolving economic development and initiative fund, and to revise certain provisions relating to the sale of certain surplus property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 740 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 677 | |
2011-03-08 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 688 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 636 | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 614 | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 599 | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 573 | |
2011-02-28 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 546 | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 501 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 479 | |
2011-02-16 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 411 | |
2011-02-16 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1231oa | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 222 |
Subjects
Appropriation
Board of Regents
Office of the Governor
Public Property
Purchases and Contracts
Real Estate
REDI Fund
Board of Regents
Office of the Governor
Public Property
Purchases and Contracts
Real Estate
REDI Fund