SD HB1229 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2024 H.J. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2024 H.J. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Add a county as able to be assigned responsibility for secondary highways on municipal boundaries.
Title
Add a county as able to be assigned responsibility for secondary highways on municipal boundaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2024 H.J. 498 |
2024-02-29 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 29, 2024 H.J. 436 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 448 |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 417 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 412 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 345 |
2024-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 335 |
2024-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 334 Amendment 1229C |
2024-02-13 | House | Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 319 |
2024-02-08 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-08 | House | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-08 | House | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1229B |
2024-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 213 |