SD HB1227 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. H.J. 387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. H.J. 387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a Commission on Indian Affairs.
Title
Create a Commission on Indian Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. H.J. 387 |
2018-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-05 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2018-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-02 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 204 |