SD HB1227 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 37. H.J. 520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 37. H.J. 520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize counties to impose sales and use taxes.
Title
Authorize counties to impose sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 37. H.J. 520 |
2015-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 503 |
2015-02-19 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 6. H.J. 464 |
2015-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to House Taxation H.J. 285 |
2015-02-03 | House | First read in House H.J. 265 |