SD HB1227 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions with regard to the rights of industrial and construction equipment dealers.
Title
Revise certain provisions with regard to the rights of industrial and construction equipment dealers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor H.J. 727 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688 | |
2012-02-28 | Signed by President S.J. 605 | |
2012-02-27 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 639 | |
2012-02-24 | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 600 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 509 | |
2012-02-16 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 463 | |
2012-02-16 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1227jb | |
2012-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-13 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 387 | |
2012-02-10 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 417 | |
2012-02-08 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 353 | |
2012-02-08 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1227ja | |
2012-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 197 |