SD HB1226 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Commerce Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 505
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Commerce Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 505
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Set certain age requirements for persons who sell malt beverages and South Dakota made wine at certain alcoholic beverage off-sale licensees.
Title
Set certain age requirements for persons who sell malt beverages and South Dakota made wine at certain alcoholic beverage off-sale licensees.
Sponsors
Rep. Mitchell Fargen [D] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Sen. Kathleen Miles [D] | Sen. Eldon Nygaard [D] |
Rep. Charles Turbiville [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Commerce Tabled (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Commerce Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 505 | |
2010-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce S.J. 461 | |
2010-02-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 20. H.J. 589 | |
2010-02-22 | Commerce Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 505 | |
2010-02-22 | Commerce Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1226sa | |
2010-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-17 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-02 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce H.J. 262 |