SD HB1225 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 34. H.J. 541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 34. H.J. 541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a determinant in identifying a student's sexual identity for the purpose of participation in high school athletics.
Title
Establish a determinant in identifying a student's sexual identity for the purpose of participation in high school athletics.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Sen. Arch Beal [R] | Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] | Rep. Jon Hansen [R] |
Rep. Tina Mulally [R] | Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Sen. Joshua Klumb [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-25 - House - House Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Health and Human Services Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-25 - House - House Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Health and Human Services Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 34. H.J. 541 |
2019-02-25 | House | Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed, YEAS 37, NAYS 28. H.J. 518 |
2019-02-21 | House | Health and Human Services Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 476 |
2019-02-21 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 6. |
2019-02-21 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1225ja |
2019-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 280 |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 258 |