SD HB1221 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide an appropriation for the commissioning and placement of presidential statues.
Title
Provide an appropriation for the commissioning and placement of presidential statues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1221A |
2021-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 212 |
2021-02-03 | House | First Reading House H.J. 190 |