SD HB1221 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish a task force on teen driving safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish a task force on teen driving safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-28 Signed by Governor H.J. 740
2011-03-10 Signed by President S.J. 688
2011-03-10 Delivered to the Governor H.J. 727
2011-03-09 Signed by Speaker H.J. 706
2011-03-08 Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 648
2011-03-07 Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 631
2011-03-03 Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 616
2011-03-02 Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 585
2011-03-02 Scheduled for hearing
2011-02-15 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 433
2011-02-14 House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 24. H.J. 382
2011-02-10 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 359
2011-02-08 Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 318
2011-02-08 Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1221oa
2011-02-08 Scheduled for hearing
2011-01-31 First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 220

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback