SD HB1220 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 6. H.J. 476
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Accommodate legislation to enhance education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accommodate legislation to enhance education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22HouseEducation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 6. H.J. 476
2019-02-22HouseEducation Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 8.
2019-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-20HouseEducation Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1220ka
2019-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31HouseReferred to House Education H.J. 280
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 257

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback