SD HB1220 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conditionally repeal certain provisions establishing network adequacy standards, quality assessment and improvement requirements, utilization review and benefit determination requirements, and grievance procedures for managed health care plans, and certain standards for managed health care plans if the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act is found to be unconstitutional.
Title
Conditionally repeal certain provisions establishing network adequacy standards, quality assessment and improvement requirements, utilization review and benefit determination requirements, and grievance procedures for managed health care plans, and certain standards for managed health care plans if the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act is found to be unconstitutional.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor H.J. 734 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by President S.J. 629 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 4. S.J. 609 | |
2012-02-27 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. S.J. 571 | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 439 | |
2012-02-14 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 18. H.J. 471 | |
2012-02-13 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 427 | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 195 |