SD HB1217 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Signed by Governor H.J. 604
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Signed by Governor H.J. 604
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the James River Water Development District.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the James River Water Development District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 604 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 581 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 552 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 550 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 509 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 488 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 447 |
2015-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 439 |
2015-02-12 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Title amended, Passed H.J. 395 Amendment 1217ota |
2015-02-12 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2015-02-12 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1217oa |
2015-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 285 |
2015-02-03 | House | First read in House H.J. 264 |