SD HB1216 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding sexual harassment.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding sexual harassment.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Sullivan [D] | Rep. Erin Healy [D] | Rep. Rebecca Reimer [R] | Rep. James Wangsness [R] |
Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] | Sen. Jessica Castleberry [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 H.J. 626 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 491 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 547 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 455 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1216B |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-03-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 385 |
2020-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 1. H.J. 421 |
2020-02-26 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-26 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-26 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1216A |
2020-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-04 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 117 |