SD HB1216 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 22, NAYS 46. H.J. 389
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 22, NAYS 46. H.J. 389
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the limitation on the total amount of revenue payable from taxes on real property for all taxing districts, except school districts.
Title
Repeal the limitation on the total amount of revenue payable from taxes on real property for all taxing districts, except school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 22, NAYS 46. H.J. 389 |
2015-02-10 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 4. H.J. 358 |
2015-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to House Taxation H.J. 285 |
2015-02-03 | House | First read in House H.J. 263 |