SD HB1213 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 17. S.J. 469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 17. S.J. 469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Dr. Nicholas W. Drummond Center for Civic Engagement at Black Hills State University.
Title
Create the Dr. Nicholas W. Drummond Center for Civic Engagement at Black Hills State University.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - Referred to (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - Referred to (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 17. S.J. 469 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 375 |
2024-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 5. H.J. 361 |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 212 |