SD HB1213 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 603
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provide a transfer of funds for critical teaching needs scholarships and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide a transfer of funds for critical teaching needs scholarships and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Education Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Education Reconsidered (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 38 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 603
2020-03-12SenateSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 535
2020-03-12SenateHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 593
2020-03-11SenateSenate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 491
2020-03-11SenateHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 552
2020-03-09SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 469
2020-03-09SenateSenate Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1213D
2020-03-05SenateEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2020-03-05SenateEducation Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1213A
2020-03-05SenateEducation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. Amendment 1213B
2020-03-05SenateEducation Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2020-03-03SenateEducation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
2020-03-03SenateEducation Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 4.
2020-03-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-27SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 367
2020-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 38, NAYS 30. H.J. 411
2020-02-24HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 5.
2020-02-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-04HouseReferred to House Education H.J. 115
2020-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 96

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1213&Session=2020
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/65640.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/69635.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/69818.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=33577&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=33928&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34146&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34148&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34473&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34519&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34524&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34616&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34911&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34926&Session=2020

Bill Comments

feedback