SD HB1213 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 H.J. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 H.J. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding telephone and telegraph corporations.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding telephone and telegraph corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 H.J. 696 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 28, 2018 H.J. 644 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 623 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 611 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 583 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 544 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 389 |
2018-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 346 |
2018-02-02 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 308 |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 201 |