SD HB1213 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Analyze and promote economic development for South Dakota's Native American population and to establish a task force.
Title
Analyze and promote economic development for South Dakota's Native American population and to establish a task force.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Haggar [R] | Rep. Dennis Feickert [D] | Sen. Jenna Netherton [R] | Sen. Kevin Killer [D] |
Rep. Patrick Kirschman [D] | Rep. Mark Mickelson [R] | Sen. Dean Wink [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Sen. Billie Sutton [D] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 790 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 787 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 684 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 781 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 767 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 762 Amendment Cc1213 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 668 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 662 Amendment Cc1213 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 748 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 646 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 620 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 620 Amendment 1213tc |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 602 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 575 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 562 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 540 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 510 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 367 |
2014-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 436 |
2014-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 416 |
2014-02-11 | House | Taxation Title amended, Passed Amendment 1213ftb |
2014-02-11 | House | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. H.J. 370 |
2014-02-11 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1213fb |
2014-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-04 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 265 |