SD HB1212 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 35. H.J. 428
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Add certain persons to the list of mandatory reporters of suspected child abuse or neglect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Add certain persons to the list of mandatory reporters of suspected child abuse or neglect.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 35. H.J. 428
2020-02-26HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2.
2020-02-26HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1212B
2020-02-26HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-06HouseReferred to House Judiciary H.J. 212
2020-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 96

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback