SD HB1212 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise requirements related to pregnancy help centers.
Title
Revise requirements related to pregnancy help centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2016 H.J. 881 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 871 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 607 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 861 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 855 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 570 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 540 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1212ya |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 322 |
2016-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 396 |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-11 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 376 |
2016-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-09 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 261 |