SD HB1212 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-02-18 - Withdrawn at the Request of the Prime Sponsor H.J. 430
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Criminalize abuse of an unborn child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminalize abuse of an unborn child.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-18HouseWithdrawn at the Request of the Prime Sponsor H.J. 430
2015-02-18HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-02-11HouseDeferred by Chair
2015-02-11HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-02-04HouseReferred to House Judiciary H.J. 285
2015-02-03HouseFirst read in House H.J. 263

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback