SD HB1212 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain terms regarding tort liability.
Title
Revise certain terms regarding tort liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor H.J. 720 | |
2012-02-24 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by President S.J. 548 | |
2012-02-22 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 490 | |
2012-02-16 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 463 | |
2012-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-08 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 319 | |
2012-02-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 344 | |
2012-02-06 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 326 | |
2012-02-06 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-24 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 177 |