SD HB1209 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 548
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 548
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions regarding industrial hemp.
Title
Revise provisions regarding industrial hemp.
Sponsors
Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] | Rep. Julie Auch [R] | Sen. Shawn Bordeaux [D] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] |
Rep. Eric Emery [D] | Sen. Red Foster [D] | Sen. Joshua Klumb [R] | Sen. Liz Larson [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth May [R] | Rep. Kameron Nelson [D] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Sen. Michael Rohl [R] |
Rep. Kadyn Wittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - Veto override (Y: 32 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 548 |
2023-03-27 | House | Veto override, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 35. H.J. 547 |
2023-03-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 H.J. 546 |
2023-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2023 H.J. 494 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 417 |
2023-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 446 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 16. S.J. 361 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 338 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 28 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 275 |
2023-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 26. H.J. 294 |
2023-02-08 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. |
2023-02-08 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1209C |
2023-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2023-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 196 |