SD HB1209 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 689
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 689
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to the Board of Regents for improving the National Music Museum at the University of South Dakota and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to the Board of Regents for improving the National Music Museum at the University of South Dakota and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Joint - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - House - Tabled (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Referred to (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - House - Tabled (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Referred to (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 689 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 686 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 538 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 684 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 505 |
2022-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 21. H.J. 647 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. Amendment 1209D |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 492 |
2022-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 632 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 473 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 473 Amendment 1209C |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1209B |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 328 |
2022-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 23. H.J. 433 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 8. H.J. 429 |
2022-02-23 | House | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7) House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 428 |
2022-02-22 | House | Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. |
2022-02-22 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 5. |
2022-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 156 |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 139 |