SD HB1209 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding vapor products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding vapor products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 44 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
2019-03-13SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019 H.J. 755
2019-03-12SenateSigned by the President S.J. 716
2019-03-12SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 747
2019-03-12SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 23. H.J. 723
2019-03-11SenateHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 715
2019-03-07SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 21, NAYS 13. S.J. 651
2019-03-06SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 629
2019-03-06SenateHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1209ya
2019-03-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 521
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 522 Amendment 1209ktb
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 19. H.J. 521
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 520 Amendment 1209ja
2019-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 486
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 465
2019-02-19HouseHealth and Human Services Title amended, Passed H.J. 427 Amendment 1209kta
2019-02-19HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
2019-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-14HouseHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1209ka
2019-02-14HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 255

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1209&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1209P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1209HHE.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1209H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1209SHE.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1209ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28371&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28799&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29248&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29304&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29430&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback