SD HB1209 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 2. H.J. 469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 2. H.J. 469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require any public body of the state to accept as valid all information on a person's birth certificate.
Title
Require any public body of the state to accept as valid all information on a person's birth certificate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-19 - House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 2. H.J. 469 |
2016-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453 |
2016-02-17 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 408 |
2016-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 260 |