SD HB1207 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 6. H.J. 465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 6. H.J. 465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning the school district pension fund and capital outlay fund tax levies, to provide property tax opt-out procedures for the capital outlay levy, and to revise the per student allocation.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning the school district pension fund and capital outlay fund tax levies, to provide property tax opt-out procedures for the capital outlay levy, and to revise the per student allocation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 6. H.J. 465 |
2015-02-19 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1207fj |
2015-02-19 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1207fc |
2015-02-19 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1207fh |
2015-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-17 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2015-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-10 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2015-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to House Taxation H.J. 284 |
2015-02-03 | House | First read in House H.J. 262 |