SD HB1206 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for emergency food assistance grants and to repeal the sales tax on food refund program.
Title
Make an appropriation for emergency food assistance grants and to repeal the sales tax on food refund program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Motion to strike the "Not" (Y: 43 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Not Pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Reconsidered (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Motion to strike the "Not" (Y: 43 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Not Pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Reconsidered (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor H.J. 734 | |
2012-03-01 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 717 | |
2012-03-01 | Signed by President S.J. 647 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 679 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 9. S.J. 585 | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556 | |
2012-02-22 | Appropriations Title amended, Passed Amendment 1206uta | |
2012-02-22 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 497 | |
2012-02-22 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. Amendment 1206ub | |
2012-02-21 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 439 | |
2012-02-14 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 18. H.J. 475 | |
2012-02-14 | Motion to strike the "Not", Passed, YEAS 43, NAYS 27. H.J. 457 | |
2012-02-13 | Appropriations Do Not Pass as amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. H.J. 427 | |
2012-02-13 | Appropriations Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. | |
2012-02-10 | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7), Passed H.J. 412 | |
2012-02-02 | Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. H.J. 294 | |
2012-02-02 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1206ua | |
2012-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-24 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 176 |