SD HB1203 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pay off bonds and make certain other changes necessary to effectuate a tuition freeze by the Board of Regents and the technical institutes, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Pay off bonds and make certain other changes necessary to effectuate a tuition freeze by the Board of Regents and the technical institutes, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2016 H.J. 881 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 860 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 6. S.J. 552 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed S.J. 525 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 525 |
2016-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 8. H.J. 757 |
2016-03-01 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 2. H.J. 730 |
2016-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-16 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 283 |
2016-02-03 | House | First Reading House H.J. 259 |