SD HB1203 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Withdrawn at the Request of the Prime Sponsor H.J. 409
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Withdrawn at the Request of the Prime Sponsor H.J. 409
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a state assessment and report on the effects of implementing the Clean Air Act.
Title
Provide for a state assessment and report on the effects of implementing the Clean Air Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | House | Withdrawn at the Request of the Prime Sponsor H.J. 409 |
2015-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources, Passed H.J. 326 |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 284 |
2015-02-03 | House | First read in House H.J. 261 |
Subjects
South Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1203&Session=2015 |
Text | http://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2015/Bills/HB1203P.pdf |