SD HB1203 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow school districts, for a period of two years, to transfer funds from the capital outlay fund to the general fund under certain circumstances.
Title
Allow school districts, for a period of two years, to transfer funds from the capital outlay fund to the general fund under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 497 | |
2011-02-17 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 450 | |
2011-02-16 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 429 | |
2011-02-15 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 403 | |
2011-02-14 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 384 | |
2011-02-10 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 359 | |
2011-02-09 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 332 | |
2011-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 216 |