SD HB1202 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 11, NAYS 23. S.J. 447
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 11, NAYS 23. S.J. 447
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establish procedures for the termination of services by a provider through the CHOICES waiver program.
Title
Establish procedures for the termination of services by a provider through the CHOICES waiver program.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Karr [R] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Rep. David Kull [R] | Rep. Elizabeth May [R] |
Rep. Brian Mulder [R] | Sen. Carl Perry [R] | Sen. Tom Pischke [R] | Sen. Erin Tobin [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 11, NAYS 23. S.J. 447 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 3 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 2 Amendment 1202D |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 375 |
2024-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 12. H.J. 356 |
2024-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 348 |
2024-02-13 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. |
2024-02-13 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1202B |
2024-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-30 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 198 |