SD HB1202 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions regarding reckless and unsafe driving.
Title
Repeal certain provisions regarding reckless and unsafe driving.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor H.J. 720 | |
2012-02-24 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by President S.J. 548 | |
2012-02-22 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 488 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 436 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 385 | |
2012-02-10 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 365 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 334 | |
2012-02-08 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 309 | |
2012-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-02 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 262 | |
2012-02-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 276 | |
2012-01-31 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-01-31 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 255 | |
2012-01-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-24 | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 175 |