SD HB1201 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 865
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 865
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2016, make an appropriation for teen court programs in South Dakota, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Revise the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2016, make an appropriation for teen court programs in South Dakota, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 H.J. 865 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2016 H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 555 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 744 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 479 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 463 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 441 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 421 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 405 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 371 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 338 |
2016-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 419 |
2016-02-11 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. |
2016-02-11 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1201aa |
2016-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 258 |