SD HB1200 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 38. H.J. 272
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 38. H.J. 272
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establish criteria for temporary custody and visitation orders.
Title
Establish criteria for temporary custody and visitation orders.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Pischke [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-02-07 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 38. H.J. 272 |
2022-02-07 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. |
2022-02-07 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1200A |
2022-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 156 |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 139 |