SD HB1199 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 18. S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 18. S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit collective bargaining by employees of the Board of Regents.
Title
Prohibit collective bargaining by employees of the Board of Regents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 18. S.J. 619 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. S.J. 596 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 465 |
2018-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 37, NAYS 28. H.J. 426 |
2018-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 425 Amendment 1199ca |
2018-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 413 |
2018-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 391 |
2018-02-07 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 364 |
2018-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 198 |