SD HB1198 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 485
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 485
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize dyslexia as a learning disability.
Title
Recognize dyslexia as a learning disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Senate | Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 485 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 4. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 453 |
2016-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 670 |
2016-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 642 |
2016-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 622 |
2016-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 470 |
2016-02-18 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 431 |
2016-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-09 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 257 |