SD HB1195 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 10, NAYS 23. S.J. 662
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding juvenile justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding juvenile justice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 10, NAYS 23. S.J. 662
2019-03-05SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 623
2019-03-05SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1195wa
2019-03-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 521
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 17. H.J. 536
2019-02-22HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 495
2019-02-22HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1195bb
2019-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1195ba
2019-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 252

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback