SD HB1194 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Set a minimum size for a sign about zoning changes or conditional use permits.
Title
Set a minimum size for a sign about zoning changes or conditional use permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 768 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 713 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 643 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 644 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 606 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 579 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 434 |
2015-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 16. H.J. 413 |
2015-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 401 |
2015-02-10 | House | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 359 |
2015-02-10 | House | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1194fa |
2015-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-30 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 249 |